NY A05005 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a $500,000 supplemental valuation impact grant to the West Valley central school district for the 2018 - 2019 school year.
Title
Provides a $500,000 supplemental valuation impact grant to the West Valley central school district for the 2018 - 2019 school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | print number 5005a |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00557 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 557A