NY A04986 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - signed chap.535
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the New York State and local employees' retirement system to posthumously establish a service retirement for Gustin L. Reichbach and extends the time in which the administrator of his estate may apply to obtain service credit for his service as a judge with the United Nations administration mission in Kosovo.
Title
Allows the New York State and local employees' retirement system to posthumously establish a service retirement for Gustin L. Reichbach and extends the time in which the administrator of his estate may apply to obtain service credit for his service as a judge with the United Nations administration mission in Kosovo.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | signed chap.535 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1531 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3760A |
2014-03-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4986a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.223 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.592 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.592 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03760 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4986A