NY A04963 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides science, technology, engineering and mathematics grants for the encouragement of women and minorities to pursue careers in technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides science, technology, engineering and mathematics grants for the encouragement of women and minorities to pursue careers in technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.43
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.43
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-02-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to economic development
2017-02-06Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S08614 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04963&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04963&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04963
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04963&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04963&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04963&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04963&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback