NY A04959 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Title
Extends the moratorium on the issuance of certificates of environmental safety for the siting of facilities and certification of routes for the transportation of liquefied natural or petroleum gas.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] |
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.48 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.348 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3855 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.142 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03855 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.48