NY A04958 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates as professional misconduct, engaging in sexual orientation change efforts by mental health care professionals upon patients under 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates as professional misconduct, engaging in sexual orientation change efforts by mental health care professionals upon patients under 18 years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-16SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2016-05-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2016-05-16Assemblypassed assembly
2016-01-06Assemblyordered to third reading cal.194
2016-01-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-01-06SenateDIED IN SENATE
2015-04-29SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2015-04-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2015-04-29Assemblypassed assembly
2015-04-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.201
2015-04-22Assemblyreported
2015-03-24Assemblyreported referred to codes
2015-02-09Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S00121 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback