NY S00121 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates as professional misconduct, engaging in sexual orientation change efforts by mental health care professionals upon patients under 18 years of age.
Title
Designates as professional misconduct, engaging in sexual orientation change efforts by mental health care professionals upon patients under 18 years of age.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2016-03-04 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04958 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES