NY A04950 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - signed chap.145
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to school bus safety cameras; relates to owner liability for failure of operator to stop for a school bus displaying a red visual signal and stop-arm; authorizes school districts to enter into agreements with municipalities for the installation and use of school bus photo violation monitoring systems; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to school bus safety cameras; relates to owner liability for failure of operator to stop for a school bus displaying a red visual signal and stop-arm; authorizes school districts to enter into agreements with municipalities for the installation and use of school bus photo violation monitoring systems; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | Senate | signed chap.145 |
2019-07-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.408 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4524B |
2019-05-13 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4950b |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.40 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.40 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | print number 4950a |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04524 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - signed chap.145