NY A04950 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to school bus safety cameras; relates to owner liability for failure of operator to stop for a school bus displaying a red visual signal and stop-arm; authorizes school districts to enter into agreements with municipalities for the installation and use of school bus photo violation monitoring systems; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to school bus safety cameras; relates to owner liability for failure of operator to stop for a school bus displaying a red visual signal and stop-arm; authorizes school districts to enter into agreements with municipalities for the installation and use of school bus photo violation monitoring systems; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2019-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.40
2019-03-19Assemblyrules report cal.40
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-08Assemblyprint number 4950a
2019-03-08Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-02-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-06Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04524 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - 2ND REPORT CAL.

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04950
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04950A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04950&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback