NY A04925 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - substituted by s3424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - substituted by s3424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until five years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Title
Relates to extending the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until five years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Assembly | substituted by s3424 |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.310 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S03424 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.287