NY A04916 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of education of any school district in the state to enter into a contract for the sale of advertising space on school athletic fields owned or leased by the school district; prohibits advertisements for tobacco or alcohol products or for political advocacy; requires prior approval of all advertisements by the local board of education; provides that revenue be retained by the school district making such contract; provides provisions do not apply to cities with a population of one million or more.
Title
Authorizes the board of education of any school district in the state to enter into a contract for the sale of advertising space on school athletic fields owned or leased by the school district; prohibits advertisements for tobacco or alcohol products or for political advocacy; requires prior approval of all advertisements by the local board of education; provides that revenue be retained by the school district making such contract; provides provisions do not apply to cities with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02969 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - referred to education