NY A04916 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that insurers providing rental vehicle reimbursement coverage shall not require an insured to utilize a particular rental vehicle company; requires an insurer writing automobile insurance which includes rental vehicle reimbursement coverage to inform the consumer of his or her right to choose a rental vehicle company to utilize in the event he or she utilizes such coverage.
Title
An act to amend the insurance law, in relation to rental vehicle reimbursement coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | signed chap.322 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-10 | 3RD READING CAL.748 | |
2010-06-10 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4651 | |
2010-04-14 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | |
2010-04-14 | delivered to senate | |
2010-04-14 | passed assembly | |
2010-02-25 | advanced to third reading cal.691 | |
2010-02-23 | reported | |
2010-01-06 | referred to insurance | |
2009-02-06 | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S4651 (Same As) 2010-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4916