NY A04908 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force to identify evidence-based and evidence informed solutions to reduce children's exposure to adverse childhood experiences.
Title
Establishes a task force to identify evidence-based and evidence informed solutions to reduce children's exposure to adverse childhood experiences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-11-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.51 |
2022-11-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.686 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8320 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.294 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S08320 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4908