NY A04888 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Board of Regents, the Commissioner of Education, and the Education Department shall have the responsibility to respond to the current COVID-19 pandemic, terminating certain Executive Orders issued by the Governor pursuant to section 29-a of the Executive Law, and provides for the procedure to be followed regarding future Executive Orders regarding elementary, secondary, post-secondary schools, State Universities, and other educational entities.
Title
Provides that the Board of Regents, the Commissioner of Education, and the Education Department shall have the responsibility to respond to the current COVID-19 pandemic, terminating certain Executive Orders issued by the Governor pursuant to section 29-a of the Executive Law, and provides for the procedure to be followed regarding future Executive Orders regarding elementary, secondary, post-secondary schools, State Universities, and other educational entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01747 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION