NY A04881 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Warren to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2025.
Title
Extends the authorization granted to the county of Warren to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Assembly | signed chap.285 |
2023-08-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.892 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2781A |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.155 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | print number 4881a |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02781 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4881A