NY S02781 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4881A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authorization granted to the county of Warren to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authorization granted to the county of Warren to impose an additional mortgage recording tax until December 1, 2025.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A4881A
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.892
2023-03-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 2781A
2023-03-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-01-24SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04881 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.285

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback