NY A04876 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - starred on calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to raising the age for prosecution of certain crimes; amends the definitions for juvenile delinquent, persons in need of supervision, infant and juvenile offender; creates a youth part for certain proceedings involving juvenile offenders; and establishes that no county jail be used for the confinement of persons under the age of eighteen.
Title
Relates to raising the age for prosecution of certain crimes; amends the definitions for juvenile delinquent, persons in need of supervision, infant and juvenile offender; creates a youth part for certain proceedings involving juvenile offenders; and establishes that no county jail be used for the confinement of persons under the age of eighteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Assembly | starred on calendar |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.345 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.58 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04157 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY