NY A04871 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-5)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s1535a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s1535a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain state owned and operated parking facilities to install and maintain charging stations for plug-in electric vehicles.
Title
Requires certain state owned and operated parking facilities to install and maintain charging stations for plug-in electric vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1535a |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.812 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | print number 4871a |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01535 (Same As) 2024-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4871B