NY S01535 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4871B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain state owned and operated parking facilities to install and maintain charging stations for plug-in electric vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain state owned and operated parking facilities to install and maintain charging stations for plug-in electric vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement And Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-07SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A4871B
2024-05-06SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.850
2024-05-06SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-04-09SenatePRINT NUMBER 1535B
2024-04-09SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2024-03-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.812
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a4871a
2023-06-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenateREPASSED SENATE
2023-05-31SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1535A
2023-05-31SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-31Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-31SenateRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2023-04-25Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2023-04-25SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-04-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-04-25SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.633
2023-04-25SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-01-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2023-01-12SenateREFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS

Same As/Similar To

A04871 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s1535a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01535&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01535
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01535&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01535A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01535&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01535B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SC4
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SC5
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SC6
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S1535#SF3

Bill Comments

feedback