NY A04818 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - substituted by s2720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - substituted by s2720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs New York city housing authority to first offer vacant apartments to mobility impaired tenants living on a higher floor.
Title
Directs New York city housing authority to first offer vacant apartments to mobility impaired tenants living on a higher floor.
Sponsors
Asm. Michele Titus [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Assembly | substituted by s2720 |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.212 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02720 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.51