NY S02720 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - APPROVAL MEMO.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs New York city housing authority to first offer vacant apartments to mobility impaired tenants living on a higher floor.
Title
Directs New York city housing authority to first offer vacant apartments to mobility impaired tenants living on a higher floor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.51 |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.484 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.212 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | substituted for a4818 |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-04-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.415 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04818 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - substituted by s2720