NY A04765 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s3403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Fulton, to extend the effectiveness of such chapter.
Title
Relates to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Fulton, to extend the effectiveness of such chapter.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3403 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.521 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.521 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03403 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.285