NY A04574 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.
Title
Requires utility companies to include on their bills notice of any and all public hearings concerning rate hikes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.174 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.504 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01709 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES