NY A04563 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - substituted by s4636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - substituted by s4636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Title
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4636 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.389 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04636 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - returned to senate