NY A04540 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 4540a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - print number 4540a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the weight and height restrictions on vehicles traveling south on the route from the Ogdensburg bridge to the Port of Ogdensburg.
Title
Removes the weight and height restrictions on vehicles traveling south on the route from the Ogdensburg bridge to the Port of Ogdensburg.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | print number 4540a |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01883 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION