NY A04509 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7)
Status: Passed on January 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-7)
Status: Passed on January 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account, in cities with a population of less than one million (Part A); relates to the licensing of approved elevator agency directors, inspectors, and technicians performing elevator work in the city of New York (Part B).
Title
Requires the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, operation, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices and creates the New York state elevator safety and standards board and the elevator and related conveyances safety program account, in cities with a population of less than one million (Part A); relates to the licensing of approved elevator agency directors, inspectors, and technicians performing elevator work in the city of New York (Part B).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.95 |
2020-01-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.750 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a4509a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4080C |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to labor |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4080B |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.728 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4080A |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4080c |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.545 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | print number 4509a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04080 (Same As) 2020-01-01 - APPROVAL MEMO.95