NY A04504 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-20 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-20 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires one voting member of the metropolitan transportation authority be a transit dependent individual.
Title
Requires one voting member of the metropolitan transportation authority be a transit dependent individual.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-20 | Assembly | approval memo.32 |
2023-11-20 | Assembly | signed chap.672 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1639 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5069A |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.171 |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | print number 4504a |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05069 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4504A