NY A04495 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring the commissioner to implement an online program to provide employees with the ability to file a complaint and access the status of his or her case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring the commissioner to implement an online program to provide employees with the ability to file a complaint and access the status of his or her case.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-03Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to labor
2015-03-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2015-02-03Assemblyreferred to labor

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback