NY A04474 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.401
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1960
2019-05-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-20Assemblyhome rule request
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.294
2019-05-06Assemblyreported
2019-02-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01960 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4474

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback