NY A04474 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Washington to impose an additional 25 cents per $100 of debt, mortgage recording tax; revenue therefrom shall be used for community college purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.695 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.401 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1960 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.294 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01960 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.695