NY A04392 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.
Title
Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Assembly | tabled |
2021-12-29 | Assembly | vetoed memo.70 |
2021-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1783 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6092 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.428 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.428 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06092 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4392