NY A04356 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - print number 4356a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - print number 4356a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to identifying the sources of campaign telephone canvasses or "push polls".
Title
Relates to identifying the sources of campaign telephone canvasses or "push polls".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | Assembly | print number 4356a |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S02427 (Same As) 2012-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 2427A