NY A04350 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirement for policyholders to provide notice to withdraw from the state insurance fund.
Title
Relates to the requirement for policyholders to provide notice to withdraw from the state insurance fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] |
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. David DiPietro [R] | Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.166 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.122 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.122 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 4350a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03516 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - PRINT NUMBER 3516A