NY A04319 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to parole eligibility for certain inmates age fifty-five or older.
Title
Relates to parole eligibility for certain inmates age fifty-five or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-11-27 | Assembly | print number 4319b |
2019-11-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | print number 4319a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S02144 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION