NY A04314 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-5)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-09 - print number 4314c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to sentencing and resentencing in domestic violence cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to sentencing and resentencing in domestic violence cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-09Assemblyprint number 4314c
2014-04-09Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2013-05-14Assemblyprint number 4314b
2013-05-14Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2013-03-25Assemblyprint number 4314a
2013-03-25Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2013-02-04Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03337 (Same As) 2014-04-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3337C

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback