NY A04292 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s2243a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s2243a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain not-for-profits to make purchases through use of county contracts.
Title
Allows certain not-for-profits to make purchases through use of county contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s2243a |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4292a |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.591 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-01-30 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02243 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.360