NY A04257 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - signed chap.310
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for online and in-person instruction and examination of election inspectors, poll clerks and election coordinators.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for online and in-person instruction and examination of election inspectors, poll clerks and election coordinators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-27Senatesigned chap.310
2021-07-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2021-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1686
2021-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1277A
2021-06-01SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2021-06-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-06-01Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.175
2021-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.175
2021-06-01Assemblyreported
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-04Assemblyprint number 4257a
2021-05-04Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to election law
2021-02-01Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01277 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4257A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A4257
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04257&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04257
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04257&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04257A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04257&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04257&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04257&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A4257#SF1

Bill Comments 750

feedback