NY A04216 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "Dominic Murray sudden cardiac arrest prevention act"; requires certain coaches to receive first aid instruction in recognizing signs or symptoms of sudden cardiac arrest.
Title
Establishes the "Dominic Murray sudden cardiac arrest prevention act"; requires certain coaches to receive first aid instruction in recognizing signs or symptoms of sudden cardiac arrest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 4216b |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | print number 4216a |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07848 (Same As) 2016-05-17 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION