NY A04213 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the month of September as firefighter, police officer and emergency medical technician appreciation month.
Title
Designates the month of September as firefighter, police officer and emergency medical technician appreciation month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00230 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to governmental operations