NY A04211 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-9)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the class D felony of criminal street gang recruitment on school grounds; authorizes municipalities to place gang free school zone signs on highways passing through school grounds.
Title
Establishes the class D felony of criminal street gang recruitment on school grounds; authorizes municipalities to place gang free school zone signs on highways passing through school grounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02940 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - referred to codes