NY A04151 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.314
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.314
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.314 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.515 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | print number 4151a |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04055 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES