NY S04055 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the sale of crib bumper pads and to restricting the use of such pads in certain settings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.220 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4055B |
2017-03-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4055A |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.253 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04151 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.314