NY A04141 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - held for consideration in tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a blue ribbon commission on fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry to examine, evaluate and make recommendations regarding methods to promote fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry; provides such commission shall consist of eleven appointed members; requires a report to the governor and legislature on or before December 31, 2022.
Title
Establishes a blue ribbon commission on fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry to examine, evaluate and make recommendations regarding methods to promote fair competition in the outdoor recreation industry; provides such commission shall consist of eleven appointed members; requires a report to the governor and legislature on or before December 31, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Assembly | held for consideration in tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S05007 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION