NY A04138 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Down syndrome awareness program to provide up-to-date and evidence-based information on Down syndrome to health care providers who order tests for a pregnant woman or infants to screen for Down syndrome.
Title
Creates a Down syndrome awareness program to provide up-to-date and evidence-based information on Down syndrome to health care providers who order tests for a pregnant woman or infants to screen for Down syndrome.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | reference changed to health |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | print number 4138a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S00593 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH