NY A04093 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the payment of regular wages to bay constables employed by the town of Hempstead, Nassau county, who have sustained injuries or illnesses in the line of duty.
Title
Requires the payment of regular wages to bay constables employed by the town of Hempstead, Nassau county, who have sustained injuries or illnesses in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.403 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.403 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-02-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |