NY A04017 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2016 with the governor, the comptroller and the chairmen of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, on its operations and transactions conforming, as far as feasible, with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Title
Requires power authority of the state of New York to file a report annually commencing March 31, 2016 with the governor, the comptroller and the chairmen of the assembly ways and means and the senate finance committees, respectively, on its operations and transactions conforming, as far as feasible, with the uniform system of accounts required for electric corporations pursuant to the public service law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | committed to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.194 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.46 |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S01183 (Same As) 2014-01-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN