NY A04002 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - signed chap.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Service Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Service Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-25Senatesigned chap.52
2011-03-24Assemblydelivered to governor
2011-03-16SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-03-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-03-16Senate3RD READING CAL.230
2011-03-16SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2802
2011-03-16SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2011-03-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-03-16Assemblypassed assembly
2011-03-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.5
2011-03-15Assemblyrules report cal.5
2011-03-15Assemblyreported
2011-03-15Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-02-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S02802 (Same As) 2011-03-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4002

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback