NY A03976 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for confidentiality of records in proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex or labor trafficking and compelling prostitution.
Title
Provides for confidentiality of records in proceedings to vacate convictions for offenses resulting from sex or labor trafficking and compelling prostitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 3976a |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |