NY A03944 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "port authority of New York and New Jersey transparency and accountability act of 2014"; relates to the functioning of the port authority as an open, transparent and accountable interstate public authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "port authority of New York and New Jersey transparency and accountability act of 2014"; relates to the functioning of the port authority as an open, transparent and accountable interstate public authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senatetabled
2014-12-27Senatevetoed memo.569
2014-12-16Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1503
2014-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7721
2014-06-11SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2014-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.126
2014-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.126
2014-06-11Assemblyreported
2014-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-05-30Assemblyprint number 3944c
2014-05-30Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2014-05-27Assemblyprint number 3944b
2014-05-27Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2014-02-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-02-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2014-01-29Assemblyprint number 3944a
2014-01-29Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2014-01-22Assemblycommitted to corporations, authorities and commissions
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.191
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-05-21SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2013-05-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2013-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.312
2013-05-07Assemblyreported
2013-04-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-04-23Assemblyreported referred to codes
2013-01-30Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S07094 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
S07721 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3944C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03944&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03944&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03944
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03944&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03944A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03944&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03944B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03944&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03944C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03944&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback