NY A03871 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires chain restaurants to place a salt-shaker-like symbol on menus next to food items that contain more than two thousand three hundred milligrams of sodium.
Title
Requires chain restaurants to place a salt-shaker-like symbol on menus next to food items that contain more than two thousand three hundred milligrams of sodium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 3871a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04930 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES