NY A03822 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions related to the farm laborers wage board, including how many times they must meet each year and additional considerations the wage board shall make when making a report to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Amends provisions related to the farm laborers wage board, including how many times they must meet each year and additional considerations the wage board shall make when making a report to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | print number 3822a |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02690 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR